Accounts and annual returns SEXUAL HEALTH AND RELATIONSHIPS EDUCATION

Charity number: 1187643
Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required