Accounts and annual returns SINGH SABHA GURDWARA SCUNTHORPE

Charity Number: 1185927
Charity reporting is overdue by 1026 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 661 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 661 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1026 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1026 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 23 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window