Financial history URSWICK TARN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 515050
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £672 £625 £549 £706 £559
Total expenditure £467 £297 £300 £939 £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A