Trustees HUNMANBY COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 515092

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Margaret Coupar | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Jackson | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Freeman Barclay | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Gorton | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bob Hartwell | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN CHARLES STUART | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Alders | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VALerie Anne MONAGHAN | Trustee | 04 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne LEYLAND | Trustee | 04 June 1985 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.