Financial history HOOE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1187358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £69.32k £47.36k £43.66k £49.73k
Total expenditure £0 £16.82k £48.77k £44.68k £47.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.70k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k £1.70k £2.38k