Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HILLCROFT

Charity number: 1186734
Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required