Trustees ROMSEY ARCHWAY U3A
Charity number: 1186820

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Green | Chair | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Roe | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Robinson | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nicol | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Trim | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Michael Crowder | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Bealing | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.