Governing document THE WOMEN'S CENTRE FOR BLACKBURN AND DISTRICT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 24 OCTOBER 1984 AND 1 APRIL 1985 AND 27 OCTOBER 1995 AND 17 NOVEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT WOMEN IN NEED OR DISTRESS IN THE AREA, WHICH IS DEFINED BY REFERENCE TO THE BOUNDARIES OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN BOROUGH, HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY (A) TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF WOMEN IN THE AREA, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE MEDICAL EXAMINATION. (B) TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE INTERESTS OF WOMEN IN NEED OF HELP AND SUPPORT AND ADVICE ON A RANGE OF ISSUES. (C) TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR WOMEN AND FACILITIES FOR PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN. (D) TO EDUCATE WOMEN IN THE AREA OF THEIR LEGAL RIGHTS AND IN THE AREA OF HEALTH CARE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
BOUNDARIES OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN BOROUGH, HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.