Accounts and annual returns AMAZING LIFE CHURCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1190252
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 April 2025 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 April 2025 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 April 2025 432 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 April 2025 432 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required