Financial history NORTHOWRAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 515286
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.47k £4.76k £29.73k £34.98k £28.62k
Total expenditure £32.18k £12.60k £29.24k £28.94k £30.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A