Financial history EAST ENGLAND MEDICAL SERVICES

Charity number: 1187161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.63k £1.18k £6.00k £4.70k £2.69k
Total expenditure £2.09k £622 £5.95k £5.27k £2.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A