Accounts and annual returns HUYTON JUBILEE COMMUNITY SPORTS HUB

Charity number: 1186972
Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 43 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 14 August 2024 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 14 August 2024 136 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 16 January 2023 291 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 16 January 2023 291 days late Download Open in new window