Financial history 2ND MARKET RASEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 515427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.76k £13.35k £13.06k £22.36k £12.29k
Total expenditure £11.05k £5.68k £10.41k £23.05k £16.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £2.67k N/A N/A