Financial history LONGTOWN HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 515429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £1.40k £32 £1.22k £1.79k £4.98k
Total expenditure £1.21k £4.85k £863 £2.77k £1.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A