Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BURITON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1189017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required