Trustees KEMBERTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 515544

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Duce | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Corrine Partlett | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Dawson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Blount | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Tomlinson | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Prescott | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Smith | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Giles Greenwood | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.