Financial history ENDMOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 515557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £9.46k £15.77k £23.27k £8.01k £9.55k
Total expenditure £13.12k £6.48k £9.57k £15.20k £8.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £19.43k N/A N/A