Accounts and annual returns LYDIATE MENCAP

Charity number: 1187742
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 November 2024 373 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 November 2024 738 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 December 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required