Accounts and annual returns SALONE EMPOWERMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1191612
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 March 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 March 2023 58 days late Download Open in new window