Accounts and annual returns ON THE STREETS OUTREACH

Charity number: 1188159
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
Annual return 04 April 2023 11 December 2024 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days
Annual return 04 April 2022 11 December 2024 676 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days
Annual return 04 April 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days