Accounts and annual returns RESURRECTION POWER AND LIVING BREAD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL EAST LONDON BRANCH

Charity number: 1188054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 01 March 2024 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 01 March 2024 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 15 February 2022 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 15 February 2022 138 days late Download Open in new window