Accounts and annual returns MIRFIELD FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL LEAVING SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 515787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 May 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 July 2023 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 June 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 May 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required