Accounts and annual returns THE FISHNET TRUST

Charity number: 515794
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 10 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 09 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 30 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 26 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required