Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF BLACKBURN WEST TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 515868
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2011 04 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2010 20 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2009 13 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 02 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required