Accounts and annual returns JOHN FIELDING SCHOOL PARENTS, STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 515964
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 August 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 January 2020 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 October 2018 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required