Trustees KIDSBANK CHESTER
Charity number: 1190234

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael George Denby | Chair | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Rebecca Mylchreest | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Rose Henderson | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Millington | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bellis | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Howse | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Kirsty Nutt | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.