Accounts and annual returns PAN AFRICAN WOMEN'S HEALTH TRUST

Charity number: 1191181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 23 April 2023 22 December 2024 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 23 April 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 23 April 2021 23 March 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 April 2021 Not Required