Accounts and annual returns GOSBERTON CLOUGH AND RISEGATE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 516137
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2006 11 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2004 21 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2004 Not Required