Accounts and annual returns D31 ART GALLERY

Charity number: 1190157
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 February 2024 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 February 2023 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time