Trustees DOMINO'S PARTNERS FOUNDATION UK & IRELAND LIMITED
Charity number: 1192290

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Barron | Chair | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ann Jones | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Benson | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry Dawes | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brett Boyers | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Pitcher | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mary Franks | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darrin Bouch | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terrence Starrett | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Tarran | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.