Accounts and annual returns KAVEH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1191336
Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 25 February 2022 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 25 February 2022 24 days late Download Open in new window