Accounts and annual returns DOUBLEEDGE (BRANDON MISSION) CHURCH

Charity number: 1190707
Charity reporting is overdue by 407 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 407 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 407 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 03 April 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required