Financial history EASTHAM ADULT TRAINING CENTRE PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 516354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £821 £309 £115.27k £2.02k £1.97k
Total expenditure £1.03k £0 £300 £916 £6.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A