Accounts and annual returns SHORT STRAW INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1190947
Charity reporting is up to date (123 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 31 October 2024 123 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 February 2024 238 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 February 2024 238 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 October 2023 474 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 February 2024 603 days late Download Open in new window