Accounts and annual returns SPENNITHORNE VILLAGE FUND

Charity number: 1191262
Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 June 2024 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 June 2024 221 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window