Accounts and annual returns CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST MAJEMUOLWASE PARISH

Charity number: 1191649
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 09 May 2024 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 09 May 2024 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 03 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 03 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 April 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 April 2022 28 days late Download Open in new window