Accounts and annual returns STEEL VALLEY BEACON ARTS

Charity number: 1192514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required