Financial history THE OPEN CENTRE

Charity Number: 516633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.84k £5.96k £35.23k £79.43k £95.64k
Total expenditure £60.88k £30.07k £51.02k £58.52k £74.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A