Accounts and annual returns THE EXCELCARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1191815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window