Accounts and annual returns TELFORD LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1191205
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 09 August 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 22 August 2021 On Time