Accounts and annual returns PEOPLE'S PRIDE SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1191841
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 15 October 2022 17 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2022 17 March 2023 On Time
Annual return 15 October 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2021 08 December 2021 On Time