Trustees WOOD GREEN RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING
Charity Number: 1191398

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Pollard | Chair | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Buckham | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Salvi | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Croft | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Travis | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Soer | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Marie Farnden | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Daum | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Pollard | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Brown | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.