Financial history 5TH BERWICK UPON TWEED (HOLY TRINITY) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 516842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/01/2020 02/01/2021 02/01/2022 02/01/2023 02/01/2024
Total gross income £3.70k £11.83k £4.51k £10.90k £2.92k
Total expenditure £2.75k £2.86k £2.18k £3.57k £8.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k N/A £2.67k N/A