GREAT BUDWORTH PARISH HALL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit the inhabitants of the Parish of Great Budworth in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities for social welfare, recreation, leisure time activities and the like. To provide a Village Hall and field for parking and recreation in the furtherance of such activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 19 November 2020: CIO registration
- 11 August 2023: Funds received from 236036 CHARITY KNOWN AS THE VILLAGE HALL AND BOWLING GREE...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Redfern | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hopkinson | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Tours | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAIN RITCHIE | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bob Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MALCOLM TORRANCE | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr David Hiett | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bill Anderson | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.38k | £4.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.83k | £5.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GREAT BUDWORTH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL AND FIELD AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREAT BUDWORTH PARISH HALL
SMITHY LANE
GREAT BUDWORTH
The Butts
Smithy Lane
Great Bu
- Phone:
- 07977223330
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window