Accounts and annual returns NORTHERN ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH INTO THE HIP TRUST

Charity number: 516995
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 28 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 23 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 07 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required