Accounts and annual returns SAXILBY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1193358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 August 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 25 August 2023 27 February 2025 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 25 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 August 2021 Not Required