Accounts and annual returns PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS OF ELLERAY PARK SCHOOL

Charity number: 517025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 January 2024 16 December 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 12 January 2023 17 July 2024 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 12 January 2022 17 July 2024 613 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 12 January 2021 17 October 2022 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 12 January 2020 14 December 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 January 2020 Not Required