Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BUCKLEY HILL HOUSE, SEFTON

Charity Number: 517093
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 16 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required