Accounts and annual returns THE WORLDWIDE BAREFOOT PROJECT

Charity number: 1193929
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 March 2025 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 01 March 2023 24 days late Download Open in new window