Accounts and annual returns RICHARD J LIVINGSTONE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1193496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 September 2024 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 September 2024 215 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 April 2023 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required